Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 312 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 312 Week
» 30602 Month
» 333792 Year
» 1555357 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2855 on 29/04/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1655 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 61655 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
29/04/1936 MIDDLESBROUGH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/429/04/1936
B17/607/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 29/04/1936
Withdrawal Thu 09/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 29/04/1936
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/09/1950
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn on 09/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC 31A Cambridge w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 09/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted
12/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2855, name: MIDDLESBROUGH
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
12/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1655    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61655    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
09/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61655    

prev prev