Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1000 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7120 Week
» 18691 Month
» 266984 Year
» 1151365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2855   29/04/1936
LNER (1946) 1655 m/e 11/1946
BR 61655 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
29/04/1936 MIDDLESBROUGH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/429/04/1936
B17/607/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 29/04/1936
Withdrawal Thu 09/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/09/1950
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 09/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted
12/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2855, name: MIDDLESBROUGH
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
12/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1655    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61655    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
09/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61655    

prev prev