Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 14 Today
» 1102 Yesterday
» 6714 Week
» 29220 Month
» 332410 Year
» 1553975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2856 on 06/05/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1656 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 61656 m/e 08/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/05/1936 LEEDS UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/05/1936
B17/611/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 06/05/1936
Withdrawal Wed 27/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 06/05/1936
MAR March on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 22/01/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 05/09/1959
31B March w/e 16/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 27/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 27/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1942 Westinghouse Brake fitted
01/1942 Vacuum Brakes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1956 York MPD (York station) December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton.
On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation.
SLS/195605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2856, name: LEEDS UNITED
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1942 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
01/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61656    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61656    

prev prev