Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1006 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7126 Week
» 18697 Month
» 266990 Year
» 1151371 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2856   06/05/1936
LNER (1946) 1656 m/e 01/1947
BR 61656 m/e 08/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/05/1936 LEEDS UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/05/1936
B17/611/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 06/05/1936
Withdrawal Wed 27/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 22/01/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 05/09/1959
31B March w/e 16/01/1960
   Withdrawn 27/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1942 Westinghouse Brake fitted
01/1942 Vacuum Brakes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2856, name: LEEDS UNITED
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1942 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
01/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61656    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61656    

prev prev