Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18704 Week
» 71720 Month
» 191247 Year
» 3218100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2857 |
on |
15/05/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1657 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61657 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1667 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Fri 15/05/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/06/1960 |
Service Life |
24 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
15/05/1936 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
31B |
|
March |
5w/e |
24/03/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/06/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
19/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/06/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/05/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2857, name: DONCASTER ROVERS Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1667 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1657 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61657 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61657 |
|
|