Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2857   15/05/1936
LNER (1946) 1657 m/e 10/1946
BR 61657 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/05/1936 DONCASTER ROVERS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/415/05/1936
B17/610/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 15/05/1936
Withdrawal Fri 03/06/1960
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 24 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 5w/e 24/03/1951
31B March 5w/e 24/03/1956
   Withdrawn 03/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2857, name: DONCASTER ROVERS
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1657    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61657    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61657    

prev prev