Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 474 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6450 Week
» 12584 Month
» 240468 Year
» 1462033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2859 on 11/06/1936
LNER (1946) 1659 m/e 10/1946
BR 61659 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/06/1936 EAST ANGLIAN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/411/06/1936
B17/509/1937
B17/604/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 11/06/1936
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys
Information This engine received a 100A boiler in 7/49 but was not reclassified B17/6 until the streamline casing was removed in 1951

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 11/06/1936
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 21/07/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 16/02/1952
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/06/1953
32C Lowestoft w/e 10/01/1959
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross 05/01/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 18/01/1947
WDN KX Kings Cross 08/08/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 24/01/1959
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
31/12/1942 L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. SLS/194302
31/08/1947 Hitchin MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Hitchin, 'Cl' 2801/41/59 and 'J3' 4138. SLS/194710
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
31/10/1954 York Area October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C.
69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November.
67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains.
73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days.
SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/06/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2859, name: EAST ANGLIAN
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1659    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61659    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61659    

prev prev