|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/06/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2860, name: HULL CITY Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1670 |
||
02/1940 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted | ||
02/1940 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted | ||
01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1660 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61660 | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
22/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61660 |