Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 72 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1309 Week
» 3891 Month
» 268524 Year
» 1490089 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2861 m/e 06/1936
LNER (1946) 1661 m/e 10/1946
BR 61661 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1936 SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/1936
B17/608/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1936
Withdrawal Thu 23/07/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1936
MAR March 01/01/1948
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1951
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 11/10/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 23/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   23/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted
07/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2861, name: SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
07/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1661    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61661    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61661    

prev prev