Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2861 m/e 06/1936
LNER (1946) 1661 m/e 10/1946
BR 61661 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1936 SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/1936
B17/608/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1936
Withdrawal Thu 23/07/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1951
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 11/10/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 23/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted
07/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2861, name: SHEFFIELD WEDNESDAY
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
07/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1661    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61661    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61661    

prev prev