Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 309 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4047 Week
» 1560 Month
» 229444 Year
» 1451009 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2862 on 13/01/1937
LNER (1946) 1662 m/e 06/1946
BR 61662 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/01/1937 MANCHESTER UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/413/01/1937
B17/603/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4124
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 13/01/1937
Withdrawal Tue 01/12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 13/01/1937
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 01/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 19/01/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   01/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
21/03/1959 Colchester shed closure Colchester shed is expected to close shortly, and its duties shared between Ipswich and Parkeston. In store are 61658/62. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/01/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2862, name: MANCHESTER UNITED
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4124
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1662    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61662    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61662    

prev prev