Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2862   13/01/1937
LNER (1946) 1662 m/e 06/1946
BR 61662 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/01/1937 MANCHESTER UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/413/01/1937
B17/603/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4124
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 13/01/1937
Withdrawal Tue 01/12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 01/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/01/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2862, name: MANCHESTER UNITED
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4124
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1662    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61662    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61662    

prev prev