Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1124 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8578 Week
» 11160 Month
» 275793 Year
» 1497358 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2863 on 04/02/1937
LNER (1946) 1663 m/e 06/1946
BR 61663 m/e 11/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/02/1937 EVERTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/404/02/1937
B17/611/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4125
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 04/02/1937
Withdrawal Sat 20/02/1960
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960
Service Life 23 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 04/02/1937
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/06/1953
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 20/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 20/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1940 Vacuum Brakes fitted
09/1940 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2863, name: EVERTON
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4125
   
09/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
09/1940 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1663    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61663    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61663    

prev prev