Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1024 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3123 Week
» 14694 Month
» 262987 Year
» 1147368 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2863   04/02/1937
LNER (1946) 1663 m/e 06/1946
BR 61663 m/e 11/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/02/1937 EVERTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/404/02/1937
B17/611/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4125
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 04/02/1937
Withdrawal Sat 20/02/1960
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960
Service Life 23 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/06/1953
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
   Withdrawn 20/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1940 Vacuum Brakes fitted
09/1940 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2863, name: EVERTON
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4125
   
09/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
09/1940 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1663    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61663    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61663    

prev prev