Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 161 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4673 Week
» 27179 Month
» 330369 Year
» 1551934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2864 on 15/01/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1664 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 61664 m/e 03/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/01/1937 LIVERPOOL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/415/01/1937
B17/610/1943
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4126
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 15/01/1937
Withdrawal Wed 01/06/1960
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 15/01/1937
CLK Colwick on 01/01/1948
WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1951
32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 16/02/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 22/01/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/03/1955
32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 23/07/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/06/1959
32D Yarmouth South Town w/e 05/09/1959
32C Lowestoft w/e 07/11/1959
31B March w/e 16/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 01/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 21/09/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 01/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works (Running Shed) The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/01/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2864, name: LIVERPOOL
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4126
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1664    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61664    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61664    

prev prev