Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 114 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1351 Week
» 3933 Month
» 268566 Year
» 1490131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2865 on 26/01/1937
LNER (1946) 1665 m/e 10/1946
BR 61665 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/01/1937 LEICESTER CITY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/426/01/1937
B17/608/1949
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4127
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 26/01/1937
Withdrawal Thu 16/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 26/01/1937
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1951
32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 16/02/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 22/01/1955
   Withdrawn 16/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ALN   9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 29/01/1955
WDN   16/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1942 Vacuum Brakes fitted
04/1942 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/01/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2865, name: LEICESTER CITY
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4127
   
04/1942 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
04/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1665    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61665    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
16/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61665    

prev prev