Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1002 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7122 Week
» 18693 Month
» 266986 Year
» 1151367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2866   15/02/1937
LNER (1946) 1666   07/02/1946
BR 61666 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/02/1937 NOTTINGHAM FOREST

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/415/02/1937
B17/612/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4128
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 15/02/1937
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 23 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
31B March 5w/e 21/03/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/06/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 22/05/1954
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2866, name: NOTTINGHAM FOREST
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4128
   
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1666    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61666    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61666    

prev prev