Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 307 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4944 Week
» 16237 Month
» 280870 Year
» 1502435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2866 on 15/02/1937
LNER (1946) 1666 on 07/02/1946
BR 61666 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/02/1937 NOTTINGHAM FOREST

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/415/02/1937
B17/612/1947
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4128
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 15/02/1937
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 23 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 15/02/1937
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
31B March 5w/e 21/03/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/06/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 22/05/1954
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN DON Doncaster on 05/08/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 07/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Doncaster MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. SLS/194710
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/02/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2866, name: NOTTINGHAM FOREST
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4128
   
07/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1666    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61666    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61666    

prev prev