Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 135 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2120 Week
» 9304 Month
» 317285 Year
» 1201666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2867   15/04/1937
LNER (1946) 1667 m/e 08/1946
BR 61667 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/04/1937 BRADFORD

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4129
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 15/04/1937
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/10/1951
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/10/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2867, name: BRADFORD
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4129
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1667    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61667    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61667    

prev prev