Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 164 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4332 Week
» 19446 Month
» 322636 Year
» 1544201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2867 on 15/04/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1667 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 61667 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/04/1937 BRADFORD

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4129
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 15/04/1937
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 15/04/1937
CLK Colwick on 01/01/1948
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/10/1951
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/10/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/05/1958
   Withdrawn on 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC WED   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 23/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works (Running Shed) The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2867, name: BRADFORD
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4129
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1667    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61667    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61667    

prev prev