|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/04/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2868, name: BRADFORD CITY Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4130 |
||
03/1941 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted | ||
03/1941 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1668 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) | ||
06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61668 | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
05/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
08/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
22/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61668 |