Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4677 Week
» 27183 Month
» 330373 Year
» 1551938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2868 on 28/04/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1668 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 61668 m/e 06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/04/1937 BRADFORD CITY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/428/04/1937
B17/606/1949
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4130
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 28/04/1937
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 28/04/1937
IPS Ipswich on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953
30E Colchester 5w/e 23/07/1955
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/10/1955
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 05/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 22/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN KX Kings Cross on 08/08/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 22/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2868, name: BRADFORD CITY
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4130
   
03/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
03/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1668    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61668    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61668    

prev prev