Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 999 Today
» 1176 Yesterday
» 5913 Week
» 3426 Month
» 231310 Year
» 1452875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2869 on 06/05/1937
LNER (1946) 1669 on 25/02/1946
BR 61669 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/05/1937 BARNSLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/05/1937
B17/609/1949
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4131
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 06/05/1937
Withdrawal Fri 26/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 06/05/1937
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
   Withdrawn 26/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC LEI Leicester (G.C.) w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CLK Colwick 14/09/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 09/04/1950
WDN   26/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2869, name: BARNSLEY
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4131
   
25/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1669    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61669    
26/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61669    

prev prev