Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1220 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19023 Week
» 72039 Month
» 191566 Year
» 3218419 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2869 |
on |
06/05/1937 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1669 |
on |
25/02/1946 |
British Railways |
61669 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
06/05/1937 |
BARNSLEY |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
4131 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Fri 06/05/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 26/09/1958 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/05/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2869, name: BARNSLEY Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4131 |
|
|
25/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1669 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61669 |
|
|
09/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
26/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61669 |
|
|