Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 150 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5243 Week
» 7825 Month
» 272458 Year
» 1494023 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2870 on 13/05/1937
LNER (1946) 1670 on 04/03/1946
BR 61670 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/05/1937 CITY OF LONDON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/413/05/1937
B17/509/1937
B17/604/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4132
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 13/05/1937
Withdrawal Mon 04/04/1960
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 13/05/1937
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
IPS Ipswich m/e 07/1949
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 21/07/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 16/02/1952
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/06/1953
32C Lowestoft w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 04/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England 22/01/1947
ALLOC BOS Boston 30/03/1947
ALLOC GRA Grantham 04/05/1947
WDN GRA Grantham 14/02/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   04/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
05/05/1951 B17\'s in service No. 61670, de-streamlined, was first seen on 5th May hauling 'The Broadsman' cars from Stratford to Liverpool St. It later worked the 4.5 p.m. to Norwich. The engine appears to be a conventional B17/6 with high capacity tender but the opportunity of putting it back into service with the handsome high-sided tender previously attached has been missed. On Friday, 4th May, No. 61177 hauled the 6.25 p.m. special non-stop from Liverpool St. to Clacton, carrying a white headboard lettered 'Tulip Time Express' in black. SLS/195107
31/10/1954 York Area October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C.
69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November.
67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains.
73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days.
SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/05/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2870, name: CITY OF LONDON
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4132
   
04/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1670    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61670    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
04/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61670    

prev prev