Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2870   13/05/1937
LNER (1946) 1670   04/03/1946
BR 61670 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/05/1937 CITY OF LONDON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/413/05/1937
B17/509/1937
B17/604/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4132
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 13/05/1937
Withdrawal Mon 04/04/1960
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS Ipswich m/e 07/1949
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 21/07/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 16/02/1952
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/06/1953
32C Lowestoft w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 04/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/05/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2870, name: CITY OF LONDON
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4132
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1670    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61670    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
04/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61670    

prev prev