Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1000 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7120 Week
» 18691 Month
» 266984 Year
» 1151365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2871   11/06/1937
BR 61671 w/e 25/09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/06/1937 ROYAL SOVEREIGN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/411/06/1937
B208/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4133
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 11/06/1937
Withdrawal Mon 22/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 22/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1942 Vacuum Brakes fitted
02/1942 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/06/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2871, name: ROYAL SOVEREIGN
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4133
   
02/1942 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
02/1942 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61671    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
22/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61671    

prev prev