Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2872   19/07/1937
LNER (1946) 1672   25/01/1946
BR 61672 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/07/1937 WEST HAM UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/419/07/1937
B17/609/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4134
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 19/07/1937
Withdrawal Wed 09/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
30E Colchester 5w/e 23/07/1955
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/10/1955
32B Ipswich 5w/e 15/11/1958
32C Lowestoft w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn 09/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1940 Vacuum Brakes fitted
04/1940 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/07/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 2872, name: WEST HAM UNITED
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4134
   
04/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
04/1940 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1672    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61672    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
09/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61672    

prev