Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 85 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1322 Week
» 3904 Month
» 268537 Year
» 1490102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2872 on 19/07/1937
LNER (1946) 1672 on 25/01/1946
BR 61672 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/07/1937 WEST HAM UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/419/07/1937
B17/609/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 4134
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 19/07/1937
Withdrawal Wed 09/03/1960
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 19/07/1937
MAR March 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
30E Colchester 5w/e 23/07/1955
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/10/1955
32B Ipswich 5w/e 15/11/1958
32C Lowestoft w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn 09/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC MAR March 01/06/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   09/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1940 Vacuum Brakes fitted
04/1940 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/07/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2872, name: WEST HAM UNITED
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4134
   
04/1940 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
04/1940 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
25/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1672    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61672    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
09/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61672    

prev