|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/04/1912 | 17/08/1912 | 113 days | General | Superheated boiler, piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted Boiler number 1213 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1920 | 18/09/1920 | 36 days | General | Saturated boiler fitted Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1922 | 20/01/1923 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1924 | 26/07/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5195 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1925 | 06/03/1926 | 92 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 25/01/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 07/11/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1943 | 30/10/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1946 | 08/06/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 195 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4541 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
27/04/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1912. Dep: 17/08/1912. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler, piston valves and 21in cylinders fitted Boiler number 1213 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
14/08/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1920. Dep: 18/09/1920. Work undertaken: Saturated boiler fitted Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
26/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
27/04/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5195 |
||
05/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 06/03/1926. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
28/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. | ||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
21/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
23/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. | ||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
01/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
03/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
05/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
04/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
16/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1470 but not taken up | ||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1479 | ||
26/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1479 from Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. | ||
03/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |