Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 237 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 237 Week
» 17573 Month
» 295369 Year
» 1179750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 424 m/e 01/1913
LNER (1924) 5424   01/03/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1473   Not applied

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1913 CITY OF LINCOLN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B19
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B1901/1913
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number GO615
To Service During 01/1913 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 01/12/1945 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping During y/e 1945 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 01/1913
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 17/08/1931
GOR Gorton 07/06/1933
LIN Lincoln 11/10/1936
IMM Immingham 13/12/1942
   Withdrawn 01/12/1945

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham 27/11/1945

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1546)
25/09/1918 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1549)
06/03/1920 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1546)
27/05/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
01/03/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 388)
31/07/1926 Converted to oil burnng
26/03/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
06/12/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 6)
11/11/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 579)
30/05/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 784)
08/01/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
24/02/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3031)
20/05/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works   General  
Gorton Works 09/03/1918 25/09/1918 201 days General
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram GC56a)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1920 06/03/1920 50 days General
Ash ejector fitted
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram GC56a)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1922 27/05/1922 78 days General
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1923 01/03/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5424
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1926 27/03/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 31/07/1926 31/07/1926 1 day Light Repair
Converted to oil burnng
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1927 26/03/1927 71 days General
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 16/06/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 23/03/1929 27/04/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 06/12/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 06/08/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 11/11/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 07/07/1934 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 17/11/1934 29 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1936 30/05/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1937 08/01/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 24/02/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1940 08/06/1940 29 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1942 28/11/1942 44 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 01/12/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) -    
01/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 424
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram GC56a boiler fitted
   
06/1913 Naming Named 'CITY OF LINCOLN'    
09/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 25/09/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram GC56a)
   
17/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1920. Dep: 06/03/1920.
Work undertaken:
Ash ejector fitted
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram GC56a)
   
11/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1922. Dep: 27/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
08/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5424
   
09/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.    
31/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil burnng
   
15/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1927. Dep: 26/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Oil burning equipment removed
   
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928.    
23/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929.    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
   
17/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932.    
07/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.    
20/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934.    
02/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13)
   
11/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
11/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 13)
   
11/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
16/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.    
13/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/05/1944 Modification Diagram 13 number 3005 boiler fitted    
1945 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    
01/12/1945 Withdrawn Condemned as 5424 from Immingham (IMM)    
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1473 but not taken up    

prev prev