Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 425 m/e 02/1913
LNER (1924 Tmp) 425C   06/06/1924
LNER (1924) 5425   16/08/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1474   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1491   22/12/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1913 CITY OF MANCHESTER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B19
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B1902/1913
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number GO615
To Service During 02/1913 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping During y/e 1947 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 02/1913
IMM Immingham 10/06/1933
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 22/02/1935
IMM Immingham 24/07/1939
LNG Langwith Junction 28/05/1942
IMM Immingham 19/06/1942
   Withdrawn 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham 04/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1913 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1547)
26/07/1919 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1548)
02/07/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
02/07/1921 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1547)
16/08/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
06/02/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1698)
20/08/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1744)
14/02/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1934)
12/05/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
21/03/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3008)
13/02/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/06/1919 26/07/1919 29 days General
Boiler number 1548 (Diagram GC56a)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1921 02/07/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 1547 (Diagram GC56a)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1922 27/01/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1924 16/08/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5425
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 06/02/1926 99 days General
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1927 20/08/1927 50 days General
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 13/04/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 14/02/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 06/08/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/04/1934 12/05/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1936 21/03/1936 50 days General
Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1937 12/06/1937 36 days General  
Gorton Works 15/10/1938 19/11/1938 36 days General  
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 16/12/1939 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 28/09/1940 09/11/1940 43 days General
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1942 13/02/1943 59 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1944 17/02/1945 64 days General  
Gorton Works 04/07/1947 04/07/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 425
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram GC56a boiler fitted
   
06/1913 Naming Named 'CITY OF MANCHESTER'    
28/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1919. Dep: 26/07/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1548 (Diagram GC56a)
   
28/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1921. Dep: 02/07/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1547 (Diagram GC56a)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
25/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.    
06/06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 425C    
21/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5425
   
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
   
02/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
   
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929.    
10/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13)
   
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932.    
10/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
22/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 13)
   
08/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.    
15/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.    
24/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939.    
28/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
28/05/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
19/06/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
17/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
   
16/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 17/02/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1474 but not taken up    
22/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1491    
1947 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1491 from Immingham (IMM)    
04/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947.    

prev prev