Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 466 Week
» 17802 Month
» 295598 Year
» 1179979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 428 m/e 12/1913
LNER (1924 Tmp) 428C m/e 06/1923
LNER (1924) 5428   02/05/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1477   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1493   25/08/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1913 CITY OF LIVERPOOL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B19
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B1912/1913
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number GO615
To Service During 12/1913 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 19/04/1947 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping During y/e 1947 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 33 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 12/1913
ARD Ardsley 10/03/1924
GOR Gorton 24/05/1924
IMM Immingham 19/07/1933
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 18/02/1935
IMM Immingham 23/07/1939
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 13/12/1942
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
IMM Immingham 20/04/1945
   Withdrawn 19/04/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN IMM Immingham 19/04/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1913 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1551)
27/07/1918 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 665)
28/05/1921 Diagram GC56a boiler fitted (number 1549)
28/05/1921 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
26/05/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1744)
14/08/1926 Converted to oil burnng
12/03/1927 Diagram GC56b boiler fitted (number 309)
12/03/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
24/01/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 388)
30/07/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1935)
19/08/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1933)
29/06/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 356)
23/01/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
02/04/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1928)
24/02/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3030)
15/11/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 763)
30/10/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 45)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/04/1918 27/07/1918 99 days General
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1921 28/05/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram GC56a)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1923 26/05/1923 43 days General
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1925 02/05/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5428
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1926 14/08/1926 1 day Light Repair
Converted to oil burnng
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1926 12/03/1927 92 days General
Boiler number 309 (Diagram GC56b)
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 31/12/1927 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/07/1928 25/08/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 14/12/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1930 24/01/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 30/07/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 19/08/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1935 29/06/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1936 23/01/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1938 02/04/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1938 27/08/1938 36 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 24/02/1940 36 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1941 15/11/1941 40 days General
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1943 30/10/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 09/02/1946 50 days General  
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 19/04/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 428, name: CITY OF LIVERPOOL
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram GC56a boiler fitted
   
20/04/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1918. Dep: 27/07/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
   
30/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1921. Dep: 28/05/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram GC56a)
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
14/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1923. Dep: 26/05/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
   
06/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 428C    
10/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5428
   
14/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 14/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil burnng
   
11/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 309 (Diagram GC56b)
Oil burning equipment removed
   
10/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927.    
07/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928.    
26/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.    
13/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
   
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
   
19/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 19/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1933 (Diagram 13)
   
18/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
25/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
   
26/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
05/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13)
   
23/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938.    
23/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13)
   
07/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
   
13/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
06/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
   
20/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 09/02/1946.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1477 but not taken up    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1493    
1947 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    
19/04/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1493 from Immingham (IMM)    
19/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.    

prev