|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1909 | 10/1909 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 03/1916 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1921 | 03/09/1921 | 151 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1923 | 22/09/1923 | 65 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 273N |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1925 | 02/05/1925 | 116 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3273 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 93 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1929 | 24/08/1929 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1930 | 07/02/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1931 | 16/05/1931 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1933 | 26/08/1933 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 273 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1031 |
||
1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/10/1909. | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/03/1916. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
06/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921. | ||
20/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 273N |
||
09/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
07/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3273 |
||
26/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
30/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. | ||
27/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931. | ||
01/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933. | ||
08/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. | ||
26/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. | ||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. | ||
13/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
16/08/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. | ||
30/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. | ||
16/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
03/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. | ||
11/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2802 | ||
30/01/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2802 |