06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 280 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1038 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/03/1909. |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/10/1912. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/05/1916. |
|
|
06/04/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
09/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923. |
|
|
02/11/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3280
|
|
|
15/05/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925. |
|
|
07/09/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
31/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1925. Dep: 13/01/1926. |
|
|
15/06/1926 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
13/12/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. |
|
|
22/02/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1928. Dep: 17/05/1928. |
|
|
22/06/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. |
|
|
29/11/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931. |
|
|
28/05/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. |
|
|
03/08/1932 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
23/09/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. |
|
|
26/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
03/01/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
28/05/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. |
|
|
19/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. |
|
|
26/08/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2809 but not taken up |
|
|
11/07/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 11/07/1946. |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3280 |
|
|