06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 281 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1039 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/11/1908. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/10/1911. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/03/1916. |
|
|
1920 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/07/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
16/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922. |
|
|
21/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1923. Dep: 01/09/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 281N
|
|
|
24/04/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3281
|
|
|
15/07/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. |
|
|
16/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925. |
|
|
15/11/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927. |
|
|
30/11/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929. |
|
|
02/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. |
|
|
07/10/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933. |
|
|
21/09/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935. |
|
|
29/01/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. |
|
|
31/05/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. |
|
|
20/05/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. |
|
|
20/10/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. |
|
|
26/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2810 |
|
|
27/08/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1947. Dep: 13/10/1947. |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62810 but not taken up |
|
|
27/05/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2810 |
|
|