Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 283   06/1904
LNER (1924 Tmp) 283N   25/08/1923
LNER (1924) 3283   30/12/1924
LNER (1946) 2812   12/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 236
Works Number 1040
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal Thu 21/08/1947
Service Life 43 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Carried out Stationery Boiler duties at Doncaster Wagon works until 6/52

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 21/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GRA Grantham 21/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 08/1909   General
Boiler number 6894 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1914 04/1914   General
Boiler number 6833 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1916 11/1916   General
Boiler number 1594 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 07/06/1922 05/08/1922 60 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/06/1923 25/08/1923 66 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1582 (Diagram 1)
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 283N
 
Doncaster Works 04/07/1924 30/12/1924 180 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3283
 
Doncaster Works 16/02/1925 05/04/1925 49 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/07/1926 25/11/1926 144 days General
Boiler number 7046 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1928 28/04/1928 86 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/12/1929 08/02/1930 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/12/1931 06/02/1932 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 04/02/1933 18/03/1933 43 days General
Boiler number 8661 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1935 20/07/1935 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/05/1937 03/07/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 8660 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 05/08/1939 07/10/1939 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/02/1943 27/03/1943 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/10/1945 01/12/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/07/1947 26/07/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev