06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 286 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1043 |
|
|
1908 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/02/1908. |
|
|
1911 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/06/1911. |
|
|
1916 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/10/1916. |
|
|
30/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922. |
|
|
11/12/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. |
|
|
07/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923. |
|
|
17/12/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1923. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3286
|
|
|
13/10/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924. |
|
|
23/03/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925. |
|
|
23/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1926. Dep: 15/12/1926. |
|
|
03/12/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 07/03/1928. |
|
|
17/03/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
11/01/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. |
|
|
30/04/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. |
|
|
02/06/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
29/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
13/03/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. |
|
|
16/02/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
17/08/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
17/02/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
14/03/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
15/09/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1940. Dep: 20/09/1940. |
|
|
12/07/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. |
|
|
20/11/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. |
|
|
17/08/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
21/04/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. |
|
|
20/05/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
09/09/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
01/01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2815 |
|
|
08/09/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/09/1947. Dep: 08/09/1947. |
|
|
17/10/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2815 |
|
|