07/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 289 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1046 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/02/1912. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/02/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
05/05/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow (General) - Arr: 05/05/1921. Dep: 25/10/1921. |
|
|
15/04/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3289
|
|
|
25/02/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1926. Dep: 04/06/1926. |
|
|
28/01/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 03/05/1928. |
|
|
19/04/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930. |
|
|
01/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. |
|
|
16/12/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1933. Dep: 03/02/1934. |
|
|
11/08/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. |
|
|
02/02/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. |
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936. |
|
|
20/11/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. |
|
|
06/01/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. |
|
|
14/02/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. |
|
|
12/06/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. |
|
|
10/07/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
15/10/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
08/07/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
08/12/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. |
|
|
20/12/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3289 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2818 but not taken up |
|
|