Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3705 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17111 Week
» 70127 Month
» 189654 Year
» 3216507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
291 |
|
08/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3291 |
|
26/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2820 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
236 |
Works Number |
1049 |
To Service |
During 08/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/04/1945 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1904 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
13/05/1941 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
15/10/1941 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
05/07/1944 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/04/1945 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 291 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1049 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/04/1912. |
|
|
01/04/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1922. Dep: 08/07/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
04/10/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. |
|
|
22/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3291
|
|
|
08/02/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. |
|
|
30/01/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. |
|
|
22/03/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. |
|
|
24/09/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. |
|
|
08/09/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. |
|
|
15/06/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. |
|
|
04/12/1937 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. |
|
|
17/08/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. |
|
|
13/05/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
15/10/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
12/12/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. |
|
|
05/07/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
31/03/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. |
|
|
21/04/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3291 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2820 but not taken up |
|
|