|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 08/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 05/1914 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1919 | 10/1919 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1922 | 01/07/1922 | 116 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1923 | 11/08/1923 | 69 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 293N |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1924 | 20/09/1924 | 107 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3293 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1926 | 08/07/1926 | 186 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1928 | 16/06/1928 | 95 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1930 | 12/07/1930 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1932 | 21/01/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1934 | 12/01/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1936 | 25/01/1936 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1945 | 21/12/1945 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | ATC gear fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1948 | 27/04/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 293 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1067 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/08/1910. | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/05/1914. | ||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/10/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922. | ||
04/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 293N |
||
06/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1924. Dep: 20/09/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3293 |
||
11/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 08/07/1926. | ||
14/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928. | ||
03/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930. | ||
10/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933. | ||
08/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935. | ||
11/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 25/01/1936. | ||
13/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. | ||
29/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
28/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945. | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: ATC gear fitted |
||
05/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
29/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2821 | ||
22/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
27/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 27/04/1948. Dep: 27/04/1948. | ||
02/07/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2821 |