|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 10/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1915 | 10/1915 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 1919 | 12/1919 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1922 | 12/03/1923 | 131 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1924 | 28/03/1925 | 111 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3295 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1926 | 22/01/1927 | 94 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1928 | 22/11/1928 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1929 | 01/02/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1931 | 15/08/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1933 | 09/09/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1935 | 30/03/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 29 days | General | Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1939 | 15/04/1939 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1942 | 07/03/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 29 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 295 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1071 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/10/1910. | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/10/1915. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/12/1919. | ||
02/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1922. Dep: 12/03/1923. | ||
08/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 28/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3295 |
||
12/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
21/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1926. Dep: 22/01/1927. | ||
21/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1928. Dep: 22/11/1928. | ||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930. | ||
31/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931. | ||
29/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1933. Dep: 09/09/1933. | ||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 30/03/1935. | ||
21/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Heating connection fitted to front end |
||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. | ||
31/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. | ||
22/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. | ||
06/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. | ||
29/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2823 | ||
08/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2823 |