Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 296   05/1905
LNER (1924) 3296   17/02/1925
LNER (1946) 2824   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 240
Works Number 1069
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal Fri 07/12/1945
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 20/12/1932
GRA Grantham 09/05/1933
NWE New England 30/11/1938
LIN Lincoln 14/02/1940
LNG Langwith Junction 21/07/1944
LIN Lincoln 12/02/1945
   Withdrawn 07/12/1945

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIN Lincoln 07/12/1945

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1911 03/1911   General
Boiler number 1658 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1917 08/1917   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1666 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 09/03/1921 16/07/1921 130 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1922 13/05/1922 52 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1923 25/06/1923 120 days General
Boiler number 7050 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 23/02/1925 27/06/1925 125 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/09/1926 30/11/1926 77 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/11/1927 10/03/1928 108 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/08/1929 12/10/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 8238 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 03/10/1931 07/11/1931 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/02/1934 31/03/1934 43 days General
Boiler number 8239 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 28/03/1936 02/05/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/05/1938 25/06/1938 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/06/1941 26/07/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 8299 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1944 14/02/1944 24 days General
Boiler number 8045 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 24/11/1945 24/11/1945 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev