Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 88 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17891 Week
» 70907 Month
» 190434 Year
» 3217287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
301 |
|
06/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3301 |
|
05/07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2829 |
|
17/11/1946 |
British Railways |
62829 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
240 |
Works Number |
1074 |
To Service |
During 06/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 22/07/1948 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ARD |
Ardsley |
on |
07/09/1947 |
WDN |
ARD |
Ardsley |
on |
22/07/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 301 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1074 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/08/1914. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/03/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
22/03/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. |
|
|
05/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3301
|
|
|
23/08/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1926. Dep: 04/12/1926. |
|
|
27/05/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 21/06/1927. |
|
|
01/12/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. |
|
|
11/05/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. |
|
|
14/02/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. |
|
|
22/07/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. |
|
|
29/02/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. |
|
|
12/12/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. |
|
|
21/10/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. |
|
|
14/12/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. |
|
|
09/12/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
08/05/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. |
|
|
07/07/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. |
|
|
07/08/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
17/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2829 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62829 but not taken up |
|
|
22/07/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2829 |
|
|