|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 10/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 07/1916 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1921 | 06/1921 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1922 | 17/03/1923 | 123 days | General | Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1924 | 23/08/1924 | 87 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4400 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1925 | 17/10/1925 | 128 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1927 | 21/05/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1929 | 05/10/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1933 | 28/10/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1933 | 27/01/1934 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1941 | 21/06/1941 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 10 days | Light Repair | At shed |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1947 | 11/11/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1400 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1076 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/10/1910. | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/07/1916. | ||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/06/1921. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1922. Dep: 17/03/1923. Work undertaken: Hulburd mechanical lubricator fitted |
||
29/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4400 |
||
12/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/06/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925. | ||
22/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927. | ||
24/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929. | ||
03/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. | ||
09/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. | ||
23/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 27/01/1934. | ||
15/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. | ||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. | ||
07/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
17/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
15/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941. | ||
03/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. | ||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
29/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2830 | ||
03/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: At shed |
||
11/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 11/11/1947. | ||
06/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2830 |