Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1103 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14509 Week
» 67525 Month
» 187052 Year
» 3213905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1401 |
|
06/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4401 |
|
28/06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2831 |
|
06/10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
241 |
Works Number |
1077 |
To Service |
During 06/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/11/1946 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1905 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/11/1946 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1401 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1077 |
|
|
1910 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/04/1910. |
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/09/1915. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
02/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1922. Dep: 22/07/1922. |
|
|
04/04/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4401
|
|
|
17/10/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926. |
|
|
22/03/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. |
|
|
20/04/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929. |
|
|
09/05/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. |
|
|
19/12/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 23/01/1932. |
|
|
02/12/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935. |
|
|
26/02/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. |
|
|
31/05/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. |
|
|
17/06/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. |
|
|
06/10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2831 |
|
|
12/10/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. |
|
|
16/11/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2831 |
|
|