Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 447 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6423 Week
» 12557 Month
» 240441 Year
» 1462006 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1402   06/1905
LNER (1924) 4402   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 2832   22/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1078
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal Tue 05/08/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1905
DON Doncaster 03/02/1924
LIV Brunswick 29/04/1925
KX Kings Cross 14/03/1927
DON Doncaster 04/08/1928
CAM Cambridge 20/12/1928
CLK Colwick 04/01/1939
DON Doncaster 29/12/1943
   Withdrawn 05/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 03/1909   General  
Doncaster Works 1912 12/1912   General  
Doncaster Works 1917 08/1917   General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow 03/05/1921 20/09/1921 141 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/07/1922 26/08/1922 27 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 27/01/1923 24/03/1923 57 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 06/09/1923 27/10/1923 52 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 07/05/1924 28/06/1924 53 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4402
 
Doncaster Works 16/02/1925 25/04/1925 69 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/01/1926 26/04/1926 88 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/03/1928 21/06/1928 112 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/03/1930 10/05/1930 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/04/1932 14/05/1932 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/10/1932 05/11/1932 23 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/01/1934 24/02/1934 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1935 18/01/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/06/1937 31/07/1937 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1939 15/04/1939 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1940 27/04/1940 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1941 30/08/1941 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1943 22/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/09/1944 07/10/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/02/1945 10/03/1945 15 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1905 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1402
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1078
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1909. Dep: 00/03/1909.    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1912. Dep: 00/12/1912.    
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1917. Dep: 00/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
03/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow (General) - Arr: 03/05/1921. Dep: 20/09/1921.    
31/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/07/1922. Dep: 26/08/1922.    
27/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1923. Dep: 24/03/1923.    
06/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/09/1923. Dep: 27/10/1923.    
03/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4402
   
16/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925.    
29/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
29/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1926. Dep: 26/04/1926.    
14/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
02/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1928. Dep: 21/06/1928.    
04/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
22/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930.    
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.    
14/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.    
27/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.    
14/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.    
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.    
04/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939.    
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.    
19/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.    
24/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.    
29/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.    
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2832    
05/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2832    

prev prev