Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 54 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7508 Week
» 10090 Month
» 274723 Year
» 1496288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1403   06/1905
LNER (1924) 4403   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 2833   06/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1079
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 42 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1905
NWE New England on 13/02/1930
GRA Grantham on 24/03/1930
NWE New England on 27/10/1930
   Withdrawn on 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 05/1909   General  
Doncaster Works 1912 12/1912   General  
Doncaster Works 1916 08/1916   General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Doncaster Works 09/08/1922 25/11/1922 109 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/04/1924 21/06/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4403
 
Doncaster Works 22/08/1925 21/11/1925 92 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/09/1927 14/11/1927 73 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/04/1929 01/06/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1931 28/11/1931 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/08/1933 23/09/1933 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/03/1935 13/04/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1936 05/12/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1938 21/01/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1941 22/03/1941 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/10/1941 15/11/1941 29 days Light Repair
Coupling rod bent
 
Doncaster Works 01/05/1943 29/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/06/1945 04/08/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/06/1947 14/06/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1905 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1403
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1079
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1909. Dep: 00/05/1909.    
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1912. Dep: 00/12/1912.    
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1916. Dep: 00/08/1916.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
09/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922.    
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4403
   
22/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925.    
03/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 14/11/1927.    
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929.    
13/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
27/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931.    
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933.    
16/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935.    
31/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936.    
10/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 21/01/1939.    
01/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
18/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Coupling rod bent
   
01/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.    
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.    
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2833    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 2833    

prev prev