Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1403   06/1905
LNER (1924) 4403   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 2833   06/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1079
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 42 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 13/02/1930
GRA Grantham 24/03/1930
NWE New England 27/10/1930
   Withdrawn 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN NWE New England 04/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1909 05/1909   General
Boiler number 1587 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1912 12/1912   General
Boiler number 6804 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1916 08/1916   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1583 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 09/08/1922 25/11/1922 109 days General
Boiler number 6798 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1924 21/06/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4403
 
Doncaster Works 22/08/1925 21/11/1925 92 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/09/1927 14/11/1927 73 days General
Boiler number 7973 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 27/04/1929 01/06/1929 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/10/1931 28/11/1931 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/08/1933 23/09/1933 50 days General
Boiler number 8666 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1935 13/04/1935 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1936 05/12/1936 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1938 21/01/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/03/1941 22/03/1941 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/10/1941 15/11/1941 29 days Light Repair
Coupling rod bent
 
Doncaster Works 01/05/1943 29/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/06/1945 04/08/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 8665 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 14/06/1947 14/06/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev