Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1404   06/1905
LNER (1924) 4404   19/07/1924
LNER (1946) 2834   14/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class C1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 241
Works Number 1081
To Service During 06/1905
Withdrawal Fri 08/08/1947
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross 03/08/1924
CAM Cambridge 20/09/1928
NWE New England 09/03/1933
KX Kings Cross 25/03/1944
HIT Hitchin (GNR) 26/03/1944
KX Kings Cross 05/01/1947
   Withdrawn 08/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross 05/01/1947
WDN KX Kings Cross 08/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1910 04/1910   General
Boiler number 1579 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1914 03/1914   General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1748 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 1920 02/1920   General
Boiler number 6803 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 10/08/1921 26/11/1921 109 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/01/1923 31/03/1923 82 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/05/1924 19/07/1924 79 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4404
 
Doncaster Works 15/04/1926 21/09/1926 160 days General
Boiler number 7882 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 06/07/1928 20/09/1928 77 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/11/1930 27/12/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 8383 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 28/01/1933 11/03/1933 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/12/1934 12/01/1935 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/12/1936 09/01/1937 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/05/1939 01/07/1939 57 days General
Boiler number 7722 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1941 18/10/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 7831 (Diagram 1)
 
Doncaster Works 09/10/1943 27/11/1943 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/01/1945 03/02/1945 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 07/04/1945 28/04/1945 22 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev